Senate | 04/24/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (131-0) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (42-0) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |