Senate | 04/24/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |