Senate | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 436 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (129-0) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {553628/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/13/2023 | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 11/20/2022 | Pre-filed |