Senate | 05/16/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 699 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {393828/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |