Senate | 05/16/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (128-4) | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (33-10) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Floor Amendment {163026/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Ready) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/16/2023 | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 11/01/2022 | Pre-filed |