House | 04/04/2023 | Hearing 4/04 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/26/2023 | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {223121/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |