Senate | 05/28/2023 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 799 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (122-14) | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {903324/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {133026/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |