Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Returned Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (116-19)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Floor Amendment {783120/1 (Senator Muse) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Floor Amendment {303723/1 (Senator Lewis Young) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {623326/1 (Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {623326/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|