Senate | 04/24/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {823422/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |