Senate | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (122-13) | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/26/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/26/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Rereferred to Appropriations | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |