Senate | 04/11/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Third Reading Passed (33-13) | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {143824/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {403728/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |