Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (133-6)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {453125/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {863221/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|