Senate | 04/11/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | First Reading Finance |