Senate | 04/24/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | House Recede | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (123-15) | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Motion Recede (Delegate Barve) Adopted | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Senate Requests House Recede | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (128-7) | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {633021/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | First Reading Finance |