House | 03/28/2023 | Hearing canceled (Economic Matters) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Economic Matters Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {123126/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Ready) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {123126/1 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/26/2023 | Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |