Senate | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {123128/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | First Reading Finance |