Senate | 04/11/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (130-0) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {453321/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |