Senate | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (123-11) | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {963225/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/10/2023 | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 10/10/2022 | Pre-filed |