Senate | 05/16/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (100-34) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Third Reading Passed (36-9) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {593121/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |