Senate | 05/16/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 713 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (130-0) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {753629/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 11/15/2022 | Pre-filed |