Senate | 05/16/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {113927/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |