Senate | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (39-8) | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Third Reading Passed (107-30) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {513420/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Referred Health and Government Operations Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Third Reading Passed (37-10) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {723923/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Finance |