House | 02/23/2023 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/16/2023 | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 11/18/2022 | Pre-filed |