Senate | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (137-2) | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {913120/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Finance |