Senate | 03/22/2023 | Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Hershey) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |