Senate | 05/16/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (106-30) | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Floor Amendment {943722/1 (Chair, Ways and Means Committee) Adopted | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Floor Amendment {973922/1 (Delegate Adams) Adopted | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {903128/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {603029/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |