EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. *sb0623* SENATE BILL 623 C7 3lr2089 SB 858/22 – B&T CF HB 257 By: Senator Zucker Introduced and read first time: February 6, 2023 Assigned to: Budget and Taxation A BILL ENTITLED AN ACT concerning 1 Gaming – Electronic Instant Bingo Machines – Maximum Number of Machines 2 FOR the purpose of allowing an entity licensed to offer instant bingo under a commercial 3 bingo license on a certain date to operate up to a certain number of electronic instant 4 bingo machines; and generally relating to electronic instant bingo machines. 5 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 6 Article – Criminal Law 7 Section 12–308 8 Annotated Code of Maryland 9 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 10 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 11 Chapter 603 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2012 12 Section 3 13 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 14 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 15 Article – Criminal Law 16 12–308. 17 Notwithstanding any other provisions of this subtitle, an entity licensed to offer 18 instant bingo under a commercial bingo license on July 1, 2007, or by a qualified 19 organization as defined in § 13–201 of this article on the premises of the qualified 20 organization may continue to operate a game of instant bingo in the same manner using 21 electronic machines, provided that: 22 2 SENATE BILL 623 [(1) (i) the machines were in operation for a 1–year period ending 1 December 31, 2007; or 2 (ii) the machines were in operation under a commercial bingo license 3 on December 31, 2007;] 4 [(2)] (1) (I) EXCEPT AS PROVIDED I N ITEM (II) OF THIS ITEM, the entity 5 does not operate more than the number of electronic machines in operation on February 6 28, 2008; OR 7 (II) 1. IF THE ENTITY OPERATED 85 ELECTRONIC MACHINES 8 ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 100 ELECTRONIC 9 MACHINES; 10 2. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 87 ELECTRONIC MACHINES 11 ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 100 ELECTRONIC 12 MACHINES; 13 3. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 100 ELECTRONIC 14 MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 150 15 ELECTRONIC MACHINES ; 16 4. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 103 ELECTRONIC 17 MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 150 18 ELECTRONIC MACHI NES; 19 5. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 200 ELECTRONIC 20 MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 250 21 ELECTRONIC MACHINES ; AND 22 6. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 278 ELECTRONIC 23 MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 295 24 ELECTRONIC MACHINES ; and 25 [(3)] (2) the conduct of the gaming and operation of the machines are 26 consistent with all other provisions of this article. 27 Chapter 603 of the Acts of 2012 28 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, a licensee or organization 29 that is authorized under State law to own or operate electronic bingo machines for use after 30 July 1, 2012, may repair and replace the authorized electronic bingo machines provided 31 that the machines operate in the same manner as those in operation by the sa me 32 organization as of February 28, 2008[, and that the organization does not operate more 33 than the number of electronic bingo machines in operation as of February 28, 2008]. 34 SENATE BILL 623 3 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 1 1, 2023. 2