Maryland 2023 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB623 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33 EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW.
44 [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law.
55 *sb0623*
66
77 SENATE BILL 623
88 C7 3lr2089
99 SB 858/22 – B&T CF HB 257
1010 By: Senator Zucker
1111 Introduced and read first time: February 6, 2023
1212 Assigned to: Budget and Taxation
1313
1414 A BILL ENTITLED
1515
1616 AN ACT concerning 1
1717
1818 Gaming – Electronic Instant Bingo Machines – Maximum Number of Machines 2
1919
2020 FOR the purpose of allowing an entity licensed to offer instant bingo under a commercial 3
2121 bingo license on a certain date to operate up to a certain number of electronic instant 4
2222 bingo machines; and generally relating to electronic instant bingo machines. 5
2323
2424 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 6
2525 Article – Criminal Law 7
2626 Section 12–308 8
2727 Annotated Code of Maryland 9
2828 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 10
2929
3030 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 11
3131 Chapter 603 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2012 12
3232 Section 3 13
3333
3434 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 14
3535 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 15
3636
3737 Article – Criminal Law 16
3838
3939 12–308. 17
4040
4141 Notwithstanding any other provisions of this subtitle, an entity licensed to offer 18
4242 instant bingo under a commercial bingo license on July 1, 2007, or by a qualified 19
4343 organization as defined in § 13–201 of this article on the premises of the qualified 20
4444 organization may continue to operate a game of instant bingo in the same manner using 21
4545 electronic machines, provided that: 22
4646 2 SENATE BILL 623
4747
4848
4949 [(1) (i) the machines were in operation for a 1–year period ending 1
5050 December 31, 2007; or 2
5151
5252 (ii) the machines were in operation under a commercial bingo license 3
5353 on December 31, 2007;] 4
5454
5555 [(2)] (1) (I) EXCEPT AS PROVIDED I N ITEM (II) OF THIS ITEM, the entity 5
5656 does not operate more than the number of electronic machines in operation on February 6
5757 28, 2008; OR 7
5858
5959 (II) 1. IF THE ENTITY OPERATED 85 ELECTRONIC MACHINES 8
6060 ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 100 ELECTRONIC 9
6161 MACHINES; 10
6262
6363 2. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 87 ELECTRONIC MACHINES 11
6464 ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 100 ELECTRONIC 12
6565 MACHINES; 13
6666
6767 3. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 100 ELECTRONIC 14
6868 MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 150 15
6969 ELECTRONIC MACHINES ; 16
7070
7171 4. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 103 ELECTRONIC 17
7272 MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 150 18
7373 ELECTRONIC MACHI NES; 19
7474
7575 5. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 200 ELECTRONIC 20
7676 MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 250 21
7777 ELECTRONIC MACHINES ; AND 22
7878
7979 6. IF THE ENTITY OPERAT ED 278 ELECTRONIC 23
8080 MACHINES ON FEBRUARY 28, 2008, IT DOES NOT OPERATE MORE THAN 295 24
8181 ELECTRONIC MACHINES ; and 25
8282
8383 [(3)] (2) the conduct of the gaming and operation of the machines are 26
8484 consistent with all other provisions of this article. 27
8585
8686 Chapter 603 of the Acts of 2012 28
8787
8888 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That, a licensee or organization 29
8989 that is authorized under State law to own or operate electronic bingo machines for use after 30
9090 July 1, 2012, may repair and replace the authorized electronic bingo machines provided 31
9191 that the machines operate in the same manner as those in operation by the sa me 32
9292 organization as of February 28, 2008[, and that the organization does not operate more 33
9393 than the number of electronic bingo machines in operation as of February 28, 2008]. 34 SENATE BILL 623 3
9494
9595
9696
9797 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 1
9898 1, 2023. 2