Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {383420/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred Health and Government Operations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {273722/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Hearing 3/07 at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|