Senate | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (131-6) | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {903424/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Hearing 4/04 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/26/2023 | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Floor Amendment {223321/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {113229/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Energy, and the Environment |