House | 04/04/2023 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {823828/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Motion Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {823828/1 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |