Senate | 04/11/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | Hearing 1/19 at 9:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 10/26/2022 | Pre-filed |