House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {743926/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |