Senate | 05/28/2023 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 805 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (37-10) | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Third Reading Passed (92-44) | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Floor Amendment {623827/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (43-91) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {523620/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (33-10) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |