Senate | 04/11/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (97-33) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 01/13/2023 | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 11/18/2022 | Pre-filed |