Senate | 04/11/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {673620/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |