28 | | - | FOR the purpose of allowing certain landlords a credit against the State income tax for 4 |
---|
29 | | - | certain rental dwelling units in which, during the taxable year, a landlord permits 5 |
---|
30 | | - | certain tenants to reside with companion animals; requiring the Comptroller to 6 |
---|
31 | | - | maintain and publish on the Comptroller’s website certain information; and 7 |
---|
32 | | - | generally relating to a credit against the State income tax for pet–friendly rental 8 |
---|
33 | | - | dwelling units establishing the Task Force on Financial Incentives for Pet–Friendly 9 |
---|
34 | | - | Housing to study certain matters and make recommendations on how to financially 10 |
---|
35 | | - | incentivize the expansion of pet–friendly housing; and generally relating to the Task 11 |
---|
36 | | - | Force on Financial Incentives for Pet–Friendly Housing. 12 |
---|
| 21 | + | FOR the purpose of allowing certain landlords a credit against the State income tax for 3 |
---|
| 22 | + | certain rental dwelling units in which, during the taxable year, a landlord permits 4 |
---|
| 23 | + | certain tenants to reside with companion animals; requiring the Comptroller to 5 |
---|
| 24 | + | maintain and publish on the Comptroller’s website certain information; and 6 |
---|
| 25 | + | generally relating to a credit against the State income tax for pet–friendly rental 7 |
---|
| 26 | + | dwelling units. 8 |
---|
98 | | - | (2) A COPY OF THE LANDLO RD’S POLICIES GOVERNING COMPANION 1 |
---|
99 | | - | ANIMALS WITH RESPECT TO THE PROPERTY . 2 |
---|
100 | | - | |
---|
101 | | - | (F) NOTWITHSTANDING THE L IMITATIONS UNDER TITLE 13, SUBTITLE 2 OF 3 |
---|
102 | | - | THIS ARTICLE , THE COMPTROLLER SHALL MAI NTAIN AND PUBLISH ON THE 4 |
---|
103 | | - | COMPTROLLER ’S WEBSITE A LIST OF LANDLORDS WHO CLAIM THE CREDIT 5 |
---|
104 | | - | ALLOWED UNDER THIS S ECTION AND THE PROPE RTIES AT WHICH EACH LANDLORD 6 |
---|
105 | | - | PERMITS THE LANDLORD ’S RESIDENTIAL R ENTAL HOUSING TENANT S TO RESIDE 7 |
---|
106 | | - | WITH COMPANION ANIMA LS IN THE TENANT’S RENTAL DWELLING UN IT. 8 |
---|
107 | | - | |
---|
108 | | - | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 9 |
---|
109 | | - | 1, 2023, and shall be applicable to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2022, but 10 |
---|
110 | | - | before January 1, 2025. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of 11 |
---|
111 | | - | June 30, 2025, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be 12 |
---|
112 | | - | abrogated and of no further force and effect. 13 |
---|
113 | | - | |
---|
114 | | - | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 14 |
---|
115 | | - | That: 15 |
---|
116 | | - | |
---|
117 | | - | (a) There is a Task Force on Financial Incentives for Pet–Friendly Housing. 16 |
---|
118 | | - | |
---|
119 | | - | (b) The Task Force consists of the following members: 17 |
---|
120 | | - | |
---|
121 | | - | (1) one member of the Senate of Maryland, appointed by the President of 18 |
---|
122 | | - | the Senate; 19 |
---|
123 | | - | |
---|
124 | | - | (2) one member of the House of Delegates, appointed by the Speaker of the 20 |
---|
125 | | - | House; 21 |
---|
126 | | - | |
---|
127 | | - | (3) the Secretary of Housing and Community Development, or the 22 |
---|
128 | | - | Secretary’s designee; and 23 |
---|
129 | | - | |
---|
130 | | - | (4) the following members, appointed by the Governor: 24 |
---|
131 | | - | |
---|
132 | | - | (i) one representative of a county or municipal animal shelter or 25 |
---|
133 | | - | animal control organization; 26 |
---|
134 | | - | |
---|
135 | | - | (ii) one representative of a nongovernmental animal shelter or 27 |
---|
136 | | - | rescue that provides services to individuals in the community; 28 |
---|
137 | | - | |
---|
138 | | - | (iii) two representatives of organizations that engage in advocacy on 29 |
---|
139 | | - | animal–related issues; 30 |
---|
140 | | - | |
---|
141 | | - | (iv) two representatives of organizations that represent landlords in 31 |
---|
142 | | - | Maryland; and 32 4 SENATE BILL 72 |
---|
143 | | - | |
---|
144 | | - | |
---|
145 | | - | |
---|
146 | | - | (v) two representatives of organizations that represent realtors in 1 |
---|
147 | | - | Maryland. 2 |
---|
148 | | - | |
---|
149 | | - | (c) The Governor shall designate the chair of the Task Force. 3 |
---|
150 | | - | |
---|
151 | | - | (d) The Department of Housing and Community Development shall provide staff 4 |
---|
152 | | - | for the Task Force. 5 |
---|
153 | | - | |
---|
154 | | - | (e) A member of the Task Force: 6 |
---|
155 | | - | |
---|
156 | | - | (1) may not receive compensation as a member of the Task Force; but 7 |
---|
157 | | - | |
---|
158 | | - | (2) is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under the Standard State 8 |
---|
159 | | - | Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 9 |
---|
160 | | - | |
---|
161 | | - | (f) The Task Force shall: 10 |
---|
162 | | - | |
---|
163 | | - | (1) study matters relating to pet–friendly housing, including: 11 |
---|
164 | | - | |
---|
165 | | - | (i) financial incentives that have potential to influence rental 12 |
---|
166 | | - | housing owners to create more pet–friendly housing; 13 |
---|
167 | | - | |
---|
168 | | - | (ii) insurance or liability structures that place burdens on the ability 14 |
---|
169 | | - | of landlords to offer pet–friendly housing; and 15 |
---|
170 | | - | |
---|
171 | | - | (3) barriers on varied sizes and breeds that prohibit landlords from 16 |
---|
172 | | - | allowing pets; and 17 |
---|
173 | | - | |
---|
174 | | - | (2) make recommendations on how to financially incentivize the expansion 18 |
---|
175 | | - | of pet–friendly housing. 19 |
---|
176 | | - | |
---|
177 | | - | (g) On or before November 1, 2024, the Task Force shall report its findings and 20 |
---|
178 | | - | recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State 21 |
---|
179 | | - | Government Article, the General Assembly. 22 |
---|
180 | | - | |
---|
181 | | - | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 23 |
---|
182 | | - | 1, 2023. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year and 6 months and, at the end of 24 |
---|
183 | | - | December 31, 2024, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall 25 |
---|
184 | | - | be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 26 |
---|
185 | | - | |
---|
186 | | - | |
---|
| 98 | + | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 3 |
---|
| 99 | + | 1, 2023, and shall be applicable to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2022, but 4 |
---|
| 100 | + | before January 1, 2025. It shall remain effective for a period of 2 years and, at the end of 5 |
---|
| 101 | + | June 30, 2025, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be 6 |
---|
| 102 | + | abrogated and of no further force and effect. 7 |
---|