Senate | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (131-5) | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {523521/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |