Senate | 04/11/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {323028/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Finance |