Senate | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (138-2) | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {493829/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {833025/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Finance |