House | 03/18/2023 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {113626/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Finance |