Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 244
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Returned Passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (98-38)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading Passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred Health and Government Operations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Floor Amendment {203721/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-32)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Floor Amendment {973426/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (14-32)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Floor Amendment {783428/1 (Senator Simonaire) Withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Floor Amendment {273829/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (13-33)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Floor Amendment {223629/1 (Senator Mautz) Rejected (14-32)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Floor Amendment {853222/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Floor Amendment {263724/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (13-32)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Floor Amendment {263724/1 (Senator Hershey)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Favorable Adopted (30-14)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Favorable Report by Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
First Reading Finance
|
|
|