House | 04/10/2023 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (40-7) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {283427/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Hearing 3/07 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |