House
|
04/10/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (100-35)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {413525/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2023
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred Environment and Transportation Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (39-6)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {543825/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Hearing 3/02 at 4:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
|
|
|