Senate | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (34-13) | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (99-36) | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Delegate Griffith) Adopted | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {713426/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Third Reading Passed (32-13) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {823826/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Finance |