House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Environment and Transportation Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {643928/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |