House | 03/26/2023 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) | ||
House | 03/26/2023 | Hearing canceled (Appropriations) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Appropriations Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Third Reading Passed (34-11) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {343822/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Finance |