House | 04/08/2023 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {903728/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Hearing 3/15 at 3:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation) | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Finance | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | First Reading Senate Rules |