House | 03/29/2023 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {153924/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | First Reading Senate Rules |