Senate | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Rereferred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | First Reading Senate Rules |